Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lopez, Jessee, Lopez, Richard E, Lopez, Richard G, Lopez, Tamara R.S., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lee & Osejo Llo, Lee & Osejo Llp, against Does 1-30, Dubeck, Paul, Paulie'S Pizza Pub, Paulies'S Llc, represented by Anderson & Leblanc, Aplc, Anderson & Leblanc, A.P.L.C, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of San Bernardino County in California. The plaintiffs in this case are Richard G. Lopez, Jessee Lopez, Richard E. Lopez, and Tamara R. S. Lopez. The defendants named in the complaint are...
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 13, 2021Answer Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 15, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 26, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of 3/28/24 minute order. |
|
March 28, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
January 16, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
January 11, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of 12/13/23 minute orders. |
|
December 13, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Offer to Compromise |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.