Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lopez Magallon, Alicia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Does 1-10, General Motors, Llc, represented by The Erskine Law Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Objection Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 17, 2023Reply Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: February 07, 2024Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: February 22, 2024Document Received
Date: February 16, 2024Witness List Filed Electronically
Date: February 16, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 08, 2021Statement of Case Filed Electronically
Date: February 16, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 19, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Reply Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Exhibit List Filed Electronically
Date: February 16, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 23, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Trial Setting Order filed
Date: November 08, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 16, 2024Declaration re:
Date: October 23, 2023Document Received
Date: February 16, 2024Document Received
Date: February 16, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 23, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 23, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 23, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 07, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 07, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
April 25, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLA PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION LIST |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLA PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM-VILATION OF CIV. CODE SECTION 1793.2(D) |
|
February 26, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed (Notices) | |
February 22, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION LIST (Comment) |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed Electronically Witness List (Comment) |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case Filed Electronically Statement of Case (Statements) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.