Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dongxiao Yue, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Bian-Wang.Com, Chun-Hui Miao, represented by Pro Per, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Treat, Charles S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTreat, Charles S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time224 days |
Complaint Filed - Summons Issued
Date: December 15, 2017Declaration Re:
Date: July 05, 2018Reply to:
Date: July 11, 2018Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: April 09, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: May 09, 2018Related Case(s)
Date: December 15, 2017Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: December 15, 2017Opposition to:
Date: July 05, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 21, 2018Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed
Date: May 21, 2018*
Date: May 21, 2018Declaration Re:
Date: May 21, 2018Correspondence Memo:
Date: August 08, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: August 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER @@X@@ @@X@@ Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH FILED |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SENT TO CLERK'S OFFICE | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing set for: Further Case Management Conference was set for 10/03/18 at 8:30 in Dept. 12 |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER AFTER 7-27-18 HEARING SENT TO DEPT 12 WITH COPY, NO SASE | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/03/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12
Judge: Charles S. Treat |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR @@X@@ FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Correspondence Memo: WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR SUMMARY OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: MIN2: THE ORIGINAL FAILS TO COMPLY WITH CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 2.113 REGARDING BINDING. CMPAM: CORRESPONDENCE MEMORANDUM PRINTED AND MAILED THIS DATE TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY(IES): 0002 *NOTPP: Notice printed for CHUN-HUI MIAO on 8/08/18 CM: PROVIDED ENVELOPE HAD NO POSTAGE. THIS IS CM: WAITING PICK UP IN THE LOBBY OF ROOM 103 UNDER CM: THE LETTER "M" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.