Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Cerda Trujillo, Abraham, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Benitez Jr., Alex John, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. Registered Owner, represented by Tucker Ellis Llp, Tucker Ellis & West Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tony Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTony Raphael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges negligence and negligent entrustment against the defendants, Alex John Benitez Jr. (the driver) and Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc. (the owner). The plaintiff, Bft H. M. Cerda Trujillo, claims that on or about November 8, ...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 02, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 02, 2020Notice
Date: July 07, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 28, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Motion re:
Date: December 15, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 02, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 02, 2024Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: January 02, 2024Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: January 02, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 08, 2024Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: January 02, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 08, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 08, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 08, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 09, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 12, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 12, 2024Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 18, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 18, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 18, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 22, 2024Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: January 22, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 23, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: January 22, 2024Trial Setting Order filed
Date: January 23, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 24, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 31, 2024Notice Filed
Date: January 25, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 31, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 31, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 08, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 31, 2024Notice Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 01, 2021Answer Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 21, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 07, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: April 04, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 04, 2024Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: April 04, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: November 03, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 04, 2021Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 31, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 31, 2024Attachment to Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 02, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 07, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: October 02, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 02, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 22, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 07, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 28, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: June 14, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 14, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 13, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 20, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 11, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 30, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 29, 2022Notice
Date: August 18, 2022Answer Filed
Date: October 20, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: October 20, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 29, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Motion re:
Date: February 21, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: February 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: April 03, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 05, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 26, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 09, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 14, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena
Date: September 01, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 09, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 17, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: October 04, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: October 16, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 09, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 11, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: October 17, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Stipulation Filed re:
Date: October 23, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 26, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 26, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: November 20, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: January 02, 2024Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
September 25, 2024 |
Department R1 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
September 25, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
September 19, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
September 19, 2024 |
Department R1 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
September 19, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
August 13, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
June 05, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
June 05, 2024 |
Department R1 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
June 05, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.