Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Brinson, Kenya, Lopez, Chazz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kazandjian, Haig B, against Does 1-50, Socal Pacific Mf Management Corp, Socal Pacific Mf Management Corp, A California Corporation, represented by Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinston Keh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended complaint for damages and injunctive relief filed by Kenya Brinson on behalf of Lennox M. against SOCAL PACIFIC MF MANAGEMENT CORP, DBA Nova Pointe Apartments, and DOES 1 THROUGH 50. The plaintiffs allege several vio...
Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 24, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: December 23, 2021Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: August 24, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 06, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 09, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 24, 2020Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: December 22, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Answer Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 22, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: December 22, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 22, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 24, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 22, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 22, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 23, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 23, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: December 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: November 01, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 22, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 12, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 24, 2023Answer Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 20, 2024Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 29, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: March 22, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional)
Date: September 11, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 20, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 31, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 06, 2023Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:
Date: July 11, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 24, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #14579592: Order for minor comp- wrong code, no fee, duplicate filing. |
|
February 22, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF KENYA BRINSON SHOWING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PETITION OF APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FOR MINORS LENNOX M. AND KIMORE R. |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Kenya Brinson showing financial hardship in support of expedited Petition of approval of compromise of pending action for minors Lennox and Kimore |
|
January 08, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Ntc of Rejection of Ntc of Settlement |
|
December 07, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Duplicate Notice of Settlement, previously processed on 9/11/23. |
|
October 30, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.