Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Dennis-Hill, Donna Lynn, Hill Iii, Charles Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Parris Law Firm, against Does 1-10, Zuniga, Antonio, represented by Ford, Walker, Haggerty & Behar, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 18, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: August 18, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 18, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 25, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Reply Filed
Date: December 24, 2020Motion to Stay
Date: January 26, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 04, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Reply Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: April 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Reply Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 07, 2021Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Declaration re:
Date: June 08, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 29, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: January 19, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: January 19, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 10, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 10, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 10, 2022Reply Filed
Date: March 17, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 28, 2022Motion re:
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 28, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 28, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Motion re:
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial
Date: May 13, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 14, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Reply Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 13, 2022Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer
Date: March 10, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 21, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Amended Answer Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 05, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 21, 2023Motion re:
Date: October 10, 2023Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: October 30, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 02, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: November 07, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 16, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 16, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
August 01, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
March 07, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed To Continue Trial and All Related Deadlines |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $20 paid on 02/06/24 for Joint stip to continue |
|
December 05, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 16, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed Elsa Hurtado CSR#14206 |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE DONNA LYNN DENNIS-HILL AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR PLAINTIFF CHARLES ANTHONY HILL, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.