Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garibay, Christian, Ramirez, Jose A., Menor-Cruz, Moises, Romero-Neri, Yolanda, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Makkabi Law Group,A Professional Corporation, The Homampour Law Firm, against City Of Colton, A Government Entity ., Garibay, Christian, Ramirez, Jose A., San Bernardino County, A Government Entity, represented by Best Best & Krieger, Deputy County Counsel, Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar, Yukevich Cavanaugh, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Death Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: October 02, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: October 07, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 10, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 10, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 08, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Stipulation Filed re:
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: November 10, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 10, 2022Declaration re:
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: January 18, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 18, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 30, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 04, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 06, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 06, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 06, 2023Motion re:
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 07, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
March 06, 2023 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
March 02, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 02, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
March 02, 2023 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
February 10, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 06, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
February 06, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: copy of minute order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.