Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Acosta, Rosa Diaz, Aviles, Griselda, Aviles, Guillermo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group, Llp, against Fca Us Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Jeep Chrysler Of Ontarioinc., A California Corporation, represented by Hawkins Parnell & Young, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is submitted by Guillermo Aviles, Griselda Aviles, and Rosa Diaz Acosta against Jeep Chrysler of Ontario Inc & FCA US LLC. The complaint alleges violations of the Song-Beverly Warranty Act and breach of warranty.
Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: June 15, 2020Answer Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Answer Filed
Date: August 18, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: June 15, 2020Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: June 27, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 15, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 17, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: December 02, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Declaration re:
Date: December 02, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 24, 2020Points and Authorities Filed
Date: December 24, 2020Reply Filed
Date: December 30, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 08, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: September 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2022 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: by stipulation regarding Plaintiffs' attorney's fees, costs and expenses |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed with prejudice |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $20 ck paid 06/22/22 for proposed order on stip re atty fees/costs/expenses |
|
March 16, 2022 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney for Defendant Appearing Remotely | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
November 30, 2021 | Hearing | Trial Setting Conference Judicial Officer McCarville, Brian S Hearing Time 9:00 AM | |
November 30, 2021 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.