Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gomez, Ricardo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Karns & Karns Llp, Karns & Karns, Llp, against Besheer, Nicholas Adam, City Of Rialto A Government Entity, City Of Rialto Police Department A Government Entity, represented by Burke Williams & Sorensen Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Cross Appeal Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Answer Filed
Date: July 22, 2020Amended Document Filed re:
Date: February 08, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: August 19, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: May 29, 2020Motion for Reconsideration
Date: April 26, 2022Stipulation Filed re:
Date: May 22, 2023Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: August 25, 2022Off Calendar Request Vacating Hearing Set Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: September 27, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: April 12, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Declaration re:
Date: April 04, 2022Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: August 25, 2022Reply Filed
Date: May 12, 2022Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 14, 2022Declaration re:
Date: May 16, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 22, 2023Declaration re:
Date: February 09, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: October 08, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: August 17, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Motion re: New Trial Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: June 29, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Declaration re:
Date: May 16, 2022Amended Notice to Reporter For Estimate of Costs filed/maile
Date: October 05, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Objection Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 22, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: April 13, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: May 16, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 29, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: August 31, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: April 18, 2022Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: November 07, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 12, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: August 09, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: April 05, 2022Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: November 17, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Declaration re:
Date: April 04, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 30, 2020Reply Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 04, 2022Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 28, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 16, 2020Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 09, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: September 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Reply Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
October 26, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed re: to Vacate Trial and Pretrial dates |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: on Stipulation to Vacate Trial and Pre-Trial dates |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5 stip |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Reporters Transcripts on Appeal Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.