Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Smith, Jasmine, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lawyers For Justice, Pc, against Dls Events, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Call & Jensen, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph T Ortiz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management246 days |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2020 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended class action complaint filed by Jasmine Smith on behalf of herself and other aggrieved employees against DLS Events LLC, a California limited liability company. The complaint alleges multiple violations of the Califo...
Answer Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: March 04, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 11, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: February 19, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: February 11, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 08, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 11, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: February 19, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 04, 2020Notice Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 22, 2020Stipulated Judgment Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: October 26, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: July 31, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 09, 2023Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 24, 2020Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 04, 2020Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 02, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 05, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 04, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 08, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 21, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically
Date: February 14, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 16, 2022Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically
Date: November 22, 2023Reply Filed
Date: December 22, 2020Motion Filed Re:
Date: December 04, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 12, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 02, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 04, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 11, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed Electronically (Statements) |
|
December 04, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference (Notices) |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed Electronically (Statements) |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment entered on 08/04/2023 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY; DUPLICATE FILING. COPY OF FILED FACE PAGE ENCLOSED |
|
August 04, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed to Continue Deadline for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.