Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Valdez, Joann, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Jaurigue Law Group, against Seiu Local 121Rn. As A California Organization, represented by Murchison & Cumming Llp, Murchison & Cumming, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 01, 2020Answer Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 04, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 04, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 04, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 21, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 28, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 22, 2024At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 21, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: February 04, 2020Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: April 08, 2024Trial Setting Order filed
Date: November 15, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: February 04, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: January 19, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: February 13, 2024Ex Parte Application
Date: April 09, 2024Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Notice
Date: April 12, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 18, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 10, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Stipulation Filed re:
Date: June 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: June 23, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 08, 2024Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: April 22, 2024Notice Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Reply Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
May 06, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
May 06, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
May 02, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
May 02, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
May 02, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
May 01, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
May 01, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
May 01, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 25, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.