Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brianna Flores, Estremera, Tania, Hansen, Dexter Norman, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lawyers For Justice Pc, against Biscomerica Corp., A California Corporation, Does 1-100, represented by Varner & Brandt, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management456 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Declaration Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: February 08, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: January 20, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: December 28, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Response Filed to:
Date: December 28, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Motion re:
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 17, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: December 02, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 11, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 09, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 25, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: October 21, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Motion to Vacate
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 25, 2023Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 15, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 15, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 15, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: October 21, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 19, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 04, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 24, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 12, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 28, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: May 03, 2022Objection Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 27, 2022Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: December 09, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 18, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 24, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: April 26, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 11, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: April 21, 2022Tentative decisions
Date: April 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Volume Begins on this Date Volume 7 includes documents filed between 02/08/23 - PRESENT |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 3 includes a split document filed on 09/26/22 decl of Paul Haines |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 2 includes a split document filed on 09/26/22 decl of Paul Haines |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 6 includes documents filed between 12/28/22 - 01/24/23 |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 5 includes documents filed between 09/26/22 - 09/26/22 (split doc) |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 4 includes a split document filed on 09/26/22 decl of Paul Haines |
|
April 26, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Tentative decisions | |
April 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | The moving party, Yesenia Romero, is the successor in interest to a deceased class member. She objected to the settlement of this matter. On January 24, 2023, the court overruled Ms. Romero’s objectio... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.