Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Ontiveros, Felix, Valdez, Ernie, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lawyers For Justice Pc, Lawyers For Justice, Pc, against Coastal Pacific Food Distributors, Inc. A California Coporation, Coastal Pacific Food Distributors, Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Littler Mendelson, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service
Date: March 11, 2024Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: January 22, 2024Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order Electronically filed
Date: December 14, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 11, 2024Declaration re:
Date: March 11, 2024Declaration re:
Date: March 11, 2024Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 12, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: September 26, 2023Statement of Case Filed Electronically
Date: March 19, 2024Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 30, 2019Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: March 11, 2024Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 12, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Supplemental Complaint Filed
Date: August 21, 2019Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 09, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 16, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 29, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 21, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 20, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 20, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 12, 2019Notice Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: July 12, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 10, 2020Answer Filed
Date: October 17, 2019Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: September 01, 2023Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 04, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 07, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 21, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 21, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Supplemental Brief Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 18, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 10, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 30, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 31, 2023Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 20, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Declaration re:
Date: March 11, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 25, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 15, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 03, 2024Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 21, 2019Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 02, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 21, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: November 13, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: November 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case Filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS' CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Plaintiff's motion for final approval; Dec. (x4); Proposed order |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of Yami Burns with respect to notice and settlement administration |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of Ernie Valdez ISO plaintiffs' motion for final approval of class action settlement |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of Felix Ontiveros ISO plaintiffs' motion for final approval of class action settlement |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of Joanna Ghosh ISO motion for final approval |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60.00 CK PAID 3/11/24 MOTION FEE |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service USPS - RTS attempted not known UTF - notice of hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.