Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whisler, Denise, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Bohart, Bonnie, Bohart, Randy, Herring, Michele, Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, Na, (total of 9) See All represented by Akerman Llp, Parker Ibrahim & Berg Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinston Keh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Complaint - Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
Motion Filed
Date: August 11, 2020Motion Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Declaration re:
Date: June 09, 2020Ex Parte Filed
Date: August 21, 2020Declaration re:
Date: August 21, 2020Points and Authorities Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Declaration re:
Date: November 21, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: December 02, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 08, 2020Motion Filed
Date: August 11, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 02, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 15, 2020Notice Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Ex Parte Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 06, 2020Declaration re:
Date: October 02, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 12, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: November 12, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Points and Authorities Filed
Date: November 12, 2019Motion Filed
Date: January 14, 2020Declaration re:
Date: June 09, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 17, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: January 20, 2023Ex Parte Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 14, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 14, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 27, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion Filed
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion re: filed
Date: June 22, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: December 23, 2019Declaration re:
Date: February 25, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 27, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 29, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 07, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: June 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 18, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: May 21, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 14, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 20, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 13, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 07, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 09, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 13, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing Filed - Granted
Date: May 22, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed
Date: May 18, 2020Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 25, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 01, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: September 09, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: August 21, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 21, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 23, 2021Ex Parte Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: August 13, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: June 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Reply Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 03, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 02, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: January 06, 2023Response to Motion (Opposition)
Date: September 23, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Request Filed Re:
Date: November 03, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Motion to Set Aside
Date: November 29, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 19, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Denied Filed
Date: May 01, 2019Motion re:
Date: June 15, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 01, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: April 30, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Request Filed Re:
Date: June 25, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: June 30, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Reconsideration
Date: August 11, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: August 17, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed Notice of association of counsel on behalf of JPMorgan Bank, N.A. |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed In support of opposition to Notice of plaintiff's intent to make a motion to set aside and vacate judgment and replace with default judgments and defaults against defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.... |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed To Notice of Plaintiff's intent to make a motion to set aside and vacate judgment and replace with default judgments and defaults against defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.... |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed DEFTS OPPO TO PLTFS "NOTICE OF INTENT TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE" |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING - On the Court's own motion the 7/26/23 motion hearing is continued to 8/9/23 at 8:30am in S33 |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset 7/26/23 motion hearing is continued to 8/9/23 at 8:30am in S33 |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion re: filed Notice of plaintiff Dr Denise Dee Whislers intent to make a motion to set aside and vacate judgment. Filed by plaintiff on 06/22/23 |
|
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Order Dissolving the Preliminary Injunction & $20.00 check no. 18077 : This is a duplicate submission, Order filed on 1/20/2023 |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Waived for Fee Waiver for Dr. Whisler for copies $4.50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.