Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Madau, Kristel, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 08, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 08, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 08, 2019Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: April 08, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 26, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2020 | |||
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 08, 2019 | |||
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/08/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KRISTEL MADAU; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/24/19 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED. |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.