Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ESQUIVEL -V- ADRIANO, ET AL Print
On April 08, 2019 a personal injury motor vehicle unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 08, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Personal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: Sep 23, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: Sep 04, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: Jun 04, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Apr 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Apr 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: Apr 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: Apr 08, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Apr 08, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: Apr 08, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
November 07, 2019 | |||
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
October 08, 2019 | |||
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MATTHEW R. ESQUIVEL. |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/08/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23. |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY MATTHEW R. ESQUIVEL. |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR MATTHEW R. ESQUIVEL. 190904-0735-CK JFN/ 150.00 PAYMT 190904-0735-CK REFERENCE NUMBER #1370 | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSUE ADRIANO, BLAS MARQUEZ. |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY JOSUE ADRIANO, BLAS MARQUEZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE 190604-0742-CK CVT/ 870.00 PAYMT 190604-0742-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK-123861382 | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY JOSUE ADRIANO, BLAS MARQUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KEITH L SHOJI & ASSOCIATES. | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JOSUE ADRIANO, BLAS MARQUEZ. 190604-0747-CK JFN/ 150.00 PAYMT 190604-0747-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK-123861387 | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSUE ADRIANO SERVED ON 05/28/19 WITH FEES OF $140.00. |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BLAS MARQUEZ SERVED ON 04/15/19 WITH FEES OF $157.95. |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE/DEFENDANT'S ACCEPTANCE UNDER CCP SECTION 998 FILED. |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE/DEFENDANT'S ACCEPTANCE INDER CCP SECTION 998 FILED. |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $25,000.00 | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23 | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY MATTHEW R. ESQUIVEL FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 190408-0721-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190408-0721-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 5541 |