Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bell Motors Llc, Metrogisticsllc, Hernandez, Mayra, Lopez, Francisco Escalera, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martinian & Associates, The Yarnall Firm, Aplc, against Alcala, David, Bell Motors Llc, Carmax Auto Superstores California, Llc A Business Entity Form Unknown, Carmax Auto Superstores West Coast, Inc. A Business Entity Form Unknown, Melchor Autotransport, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Alderman & Hilger, Llp, Kolar & Associates, A Law Corporation, Parker * Stanbury Llp, Rossi, Robert John, Tseng & Associates, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with LYNN PONCIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLYNN PONCIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2019 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions537 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: April 03, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: April 15, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 19, 2020Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 03, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 30, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 28, 2019Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: July 24, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: August 14, 2019Motion Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: September 18, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 18, 2020Motion Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Opinion Received and Sent to Department
Date: May 01, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 19, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 25, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 18, 2019Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 24, 2020Reply Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Objection Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: July 24, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 19, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 25, 2019Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Remittitur Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: June 21, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Amendment to Complaint Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 26, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: April 29, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 29, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: March 29, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 29, 2019Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 18, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 21, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 13, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 18, 2019Request for Action Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 11, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 16, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 16, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 16, 2020Reply Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 06, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 29, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record
Date: January 26, 2021Motion Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Ex Parte Filed
Date: July 08, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 15, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 17, 2021Reply Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 12, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 16, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: September 18, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 17, 2019Objection Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 08, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 05, 2020Objection Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 10, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 07, 2020Notice Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: January 07, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 08, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: December 29, 2020Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: April 29, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 01, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 14, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 13, 2020Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: November 05, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 26, 2021Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: July 21, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 24, 2019Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 26, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 22, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 06, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 08, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 07, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 18, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 01, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 25, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: April 29, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 24, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 16, 2019Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 06, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: July 24, 2019Answer Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 30, 2019Deposit and Disbursement Order
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 19, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 19, 2020Motion Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 11, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 11, 2020Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: April 01, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 02, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 06, 2020Objection Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Motion to Stay
Date: March 09, 2021Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: November 05, 2020GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee
Date: January 14, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: October 13, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 26, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: June 11, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 17, 2019Motion re:
Date: March 29, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 13, 2020Reply Filed
Date: August 22, 2019Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: July 13, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: October 22, 2019Reply Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 04, 2019Stipulation Filed re:
Date: September 19, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 16, 2020Deposit and Disbursement Order
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
December 13, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Minute order & Notice and Order re: Affidavit of prejudice code of civil procedures 170.6 |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service M/O & Notice and Order re: Affidavit of prejudice CCP 170.6 Undeliverable. |
|
July 21, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Minute Order & Notice and Order re: Affidavit of prejudice Code of Civil Procedures 170.6 |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Comment: File at CRC; Ordered this date and will route to Dept when received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.