Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Huisar, Sulin, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Adams, Christopher A, Kjt Law Group, against Applied Behavior Consultants, Inc A Corporation, Does 1-20, represented by Landegger Rivas Verano & Davis Alc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management232 days |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
|
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a first amended class action complaint for damages and enforcement under the Private Attorneys General Act. The plaintiff, Sulii Huisar, is filing on behalf of herself and others similarly situated. The defendants are identified as ...
Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Answer Filed
Date: June 28, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: April 03, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 26, 2019Tentative decisions
Date: July 29, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 14, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 26, 2019Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: November 19, 2020Motion re:
Date: July 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Motion re:
Date: November 19, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: February 25, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Motion Filed
Date: May 18, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 29, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 06, 2024Notice Imaged
Date: April 03, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 29, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 18, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 13, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 12, 2020Order signed and Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 28, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.