Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix, against Orellana, Rene, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: June 14, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 14, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 14, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 14, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 29, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: January 24, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: January 24, 2019Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: January 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
June 14, 2019 | |||
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RENE ORELLANA. | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF SYNCHRONY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF SYNCHRONY BANK FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF SYNCHRONY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/24/19 JUDGMENT FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK JUDGMENT AGAINST: RENE ORELLANA JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,510.49 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $307.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7817.99 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: ISO OF APPLICATION FOR ETNRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF SYNCHRONY BANK AS TO RENE ORELLANA. |
|
December 13, 2018 | |||
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.