Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group Llp, against Castro, Francisco X, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration re:
Date: October 24, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: October 24, 2018Declaration re:
Date: October 24, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: March 05, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: December 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed Total Cost: $135.00 / Credit: $0.00 /Interest: $0.00 |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Sacramento WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY. ( 7314.53 ) 200316-0147-CK MJX/ 25.00 PAYMT 200316-0147-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 119232 |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) |
|
May 03, 2019 | |||
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Sacramento WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY. ( 7314.53 ) 190305-0948-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190305-0948-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 66366 |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE ASSIGNMENT OF CLAIM FILED BY JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC. |
|
November 05, 2018 | |||
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.