Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Unifund Ccr, Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Office Of Kenosian & Miele, Llp, against Tafoya, Jonathan Shaun, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay H Robinson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: December 11, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 11, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 11, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 11, 2017Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: December 11, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: February 22, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: April 18, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 22, 2018Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: July 05, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Department Changed DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S16J TO S16. TO . |
|
December 11, 2018 | |||
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 22, 2018 | |||
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Re-Assign Sent to Counsel of Record, Re-Assign CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 10/22/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17 - RESCHEDULED TO: | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 10/22/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16J | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.