Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Kelly, Ingrid, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by The Myers Law Group, against Cb&I Federal Services, Llc, A Louisiana Limited Liability Company, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Bridge & Iron Worldwide Company, A Delaware Corporation, High Desert Support Service, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M. Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2016 |
CategoryEmployment-Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: May 06, 2020Subpoenaed Records Released to Parties in Dept & Rcpt Filed
Date: November 18, 2019Notice of Destruction of Exhibits Mailed to Parties
Date: October 16, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 16, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration re:
Date: August 29, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 27, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 09, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 02, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 03, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 03, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 12, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: January 13, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 30, 2017At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 29, 2017At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 30, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 13, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 23, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 03, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: October 03, 2016Declaration And Order For Release Of Exhibits Filed
Date: December 31, 2020Order for Destruction of Exhibits Signed
Date: December 31, 2020Receipt of Records/Exhibits filed
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Records/Exhibits filed All plaintiff's exhibits were released to: The Myers Law Group |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Comment: All subpoenas released; now deemed destroyed |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration And Order For Release Of Exhibits Filed | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Destruction of Exhibits Signed | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES | |
September 11, 2020 | |||
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLED) |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 26, 2020 | |||
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL(SETTLED)/STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.