Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Suttell & Hammer, Apc, against Holloway, Jacqueline M., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 29, 2015Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: October 13, 2015Declaration re:
Date: August 24, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 24, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Sacramento
Date: January 27, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 21, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 15, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 29, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: May 29, 2015Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 29, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 19, 2015Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: August 24, 2015Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: August 24, 2015Declaration re:
Date: August 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE FILED BY JACQUELINE M. HOLLOWAY. |
|
May 23, 2016 | |||
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): SERVICE COPY OF NOTICE OF MOTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): IMPROPER FORMAT. PLEASE CORRECT. |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE AS TO JACQUELINE HOLLOWAY FILED. |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Sacramento LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
November 25, 2015 | |||
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.