Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Unifund Ccr, Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Office Of Kenosian & Miele, Llp, against Chon, Maricela, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 24, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 24, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 24, 2013Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: June 24, 2013Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: June 24, 2013Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: June 24, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 18, 2013Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: February 18, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 20, 2015Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: March 13, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE - DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR FILED. |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE FILED. |
|
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 17728.72 ) 140313-1908-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 140313-1908-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 139605 |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $62.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,058.59) |
|
January 31, 2014 | |||
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
August 09, 2013 | |||
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 130718-3333-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 130718-3333-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 124327 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.