Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Target National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zwicker And Associates Pc, against Chon, Maricela, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2011 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 20, 2011Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 20, 2011Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 18, 2012Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 18, 2012Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: May 18, 2012Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 20, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 07, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 18, 2012Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: May 18, 2012Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 18, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE- DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR FILED. |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE FILED. |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF TARGET NATIONAL BANK FILED ADDING TD BANK USA N.A AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. | |
September 14, 2012 | |||
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033 FILED. (IMAGED) |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO INCUR COURT COSTS/LEGAL FEES FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK. (IMAGED) |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MARICELA CHON FILED. |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CLERK JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED) JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF TARGET NATIONAL BANK ORDERED ENTERED 05/18/12 JUDGMENT FOR: TARGET NATIONAL BANK JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARICELA CHON JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,460.26 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $304.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4764.76 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT OF TARGET NATIONAL BANK AS TO DOES ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.