Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Verdusco, Jose, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Emanuel, Todd P., against County Of San Mateo, Mar, Andy, represented by John C. Beiers, Winter, Grant A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management83 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial682 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time672 days |
Request For Dismissal
Date: July 25, 2018Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Declaration
Date: August 25, 2016Reply Separate Statement Of Material Facts
Date: December 14, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: June 22, 2016Declaration
Date: December 07, 2017Reply
Date: December 21, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: February 16, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2016Conversion Action
Date: May 10, 2016Declaration
Date: September 14, 2016Declaration
Date: September 29, 2017Answer
Date: January 13, 2017Declaration in Reply
Date: December 29, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 22, 2016Declaration
Date: December 05, 2017Declaration in Reply
Date: December 14, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 07, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: May 13, 2016Compendium of Evidence in Support of
Date: September 29, 2017Supplemental
Date: September 20, 2016Opposition
Date: December 15, 2016Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: December 05, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 14, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: October 24, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 22, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 15, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: August 29, 2016Declaration
Date: December 22, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 29, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 22, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: September 14, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: August 30, 2016Request
Date: August 25, 2016Motion
Date: August 25, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: August 24, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: June 24, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: June 21, 2016Order
Date: May 26, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: May 19, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: May 18, 2016Opposition
Date: May 04, 2016Declaration
Date: April 18, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 18, 2016Conversion Action
Date: April 18, 2016Document
Date: March 11, 2016Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 13, 2016Conversion Action
Date: March 14, 2016Conversion Action
Date: March 11, 2016Conversion Action
Date: March 11, 2016Opposition
Date: March 11, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 11, 2016Declaration
Date: March 11, 2016Motion
Date: March 11, 2016Complaint
Date: March 11, 2016Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: May 08, 2018Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: May 01, 2018Declaration
Date: April 23, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: April 18, 2018Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: January 16, 2018Order
Date: January 08, 2018Motion to Quash
Date: January 08, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 29, 2017Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues
Date: December 19, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 14, 2017Motion
Date: December 07, 2017Objections to Evidence
Date: December 05, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: October 04, 2017Document
Date: October 04, 2017Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: September 29, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: September 29, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: August 10, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: March 03, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: February 15, 2017Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 04, 2017Hearing on Demurrer
Date: December 29, 2016Answer
Date: November 28, 2016Declaration
Date: November 22, 2016Demurrer to
Date: November 22, 2016Cross Complaint
Date: October 24, 2016Notice
Date: October 03, 2016Notice
Date: September 29, 2016Order
Date: September 27, 2016Motion hearings
Date: September 27, 2016Motion hearings
Date: September 27, 2016Reply
Date: September 20, 2016Reply
Date: September 20, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Request For Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | ReOpened | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 05/08/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice AS TO DOES 1-20 ONLY Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice AS TO DOES 1-20 ONLY |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF TODD P. EMANUEL RE OSC RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION Declaration OF TODD P. EMANUEL RE OSC RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Request For Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing: 5/8/18 Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing: 5/8/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.