Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Covarrubias, Yvonne, Zahabi, Atieh, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Graham, Jeremy A., against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Macy'S West Stores, Inc., Macy'S West Stores, Inc., An Ohio Corporation, represented by Katz, Steven B, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2016 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Amended Complaint
Date: August 12, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: August 31, 2016Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 07, 2016Judgment
Date: August 31, 2017Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: February 16, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: March 23, 2017Request
Date: May 01, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 11, 2017Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
Date: December 05, 2017Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: July 17, 2017Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 10, 201610 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: October 20, 2016Complaint
Date: March 08, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: September 28, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: December 07, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: September 13, 2016Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: December 14, 2016Opposition
Date: November 22, 2016Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: December 14, 2016Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 10, 2016Points and Authorities
Date: July 17, 2017Reply
Date: July 26, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 31, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 11, 2016Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 17, 2016Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 08, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 08, 2016Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 17, 2016Conversion Hearing
Date: June 01, 2016Motion
Date: November 01, 2016Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: October 03, 2016Separate Statement
Date: November 01, 2016Proposed Order Received
Date: November 01, 2016Proposed Order Received
Date: May 11, 2017Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 11, 2017Proof of Service by
Date: July 17, 2017Stipulation
Date: July 28, 2016Proof of Service
Date: November 01, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: August 31, 2016Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 10, 2016Proposed Order Received
Date: November 10, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: November 23, 2016Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 16, 2016Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: December 19, 2016Proposed Order Received
Date: February 16, 2017Reply
Date: November 30, 2016Order
Date: April 20, 2017Proof of Service by
Date: April 18, 2017Document
Date: February 24, 2017Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 23, 2017Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: April 20, 2017Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: April 17, 2017Jury Trial
Date: October 02, 2017Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: August 02, 2016Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 03, 2016Declaration
Date: November 01, 2016Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: December 12, 2016Notice
Date: November 10, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: August 02, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: September 05, 2017Declaration
Date: May 11, 2017Order
Date: August 31, 2017Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: May 11, 2017Declaration
Date: July 17, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: February 16, 2017Document
Date: May 17, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal 12/05/2017 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Case dismissed | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Jury Trial 10/02/2017 JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 15 DAYS Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order ORDER GRANDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order ORDER GRANDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment IN FAVOR OF DEFT. MACY'S WEST STORE'S, INC. IN THE AMOUNT TO BE DETERMINED Signed by Judge Judgment IN FAVOR OF DEFT. MACY'S WEST STORE'S, INC. IN THE AMOUNT TO BE DETERMINED Signed by Judge Grandsaert on 8/23/17 |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Type: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTSigned by: JUDGE GRANDSAERTDate Signed Order Type: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Signed by: JUDGE GRANDSAERT Date Signed: 08/23/17 |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer 11 FOR SIGNATURE - (2) PROPOSED ORDERS - GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Summary Judgment 07/31/2017 Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.