Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Les Stanford Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc, Saberi, Andy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dombroski, James M., against Bj Interstate Autotransporters, Inc, Dedyk, Bogdan, Les Stanford Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc, represented by Attridge, James, Levangie, Michael J, Sidran, David Robert, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2015 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial936 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time85 days |
Motion for Issue and Monetary Sanction
Date: October 03, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 21, 2016Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: April 18, 2019Notice
Date: March 06, 2019Objections to Evidence
Date: May 10, 2019Answer
Date: April 11, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: February 01, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2016Motion
Date: November 07, 2016Declaration in Reply
Date: May 10, 2019Motion
Date: January 23, 2017Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: September 21, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 26, 2018Answer
Date: November 15, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 07, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 10, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 10, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 15, 2019Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement CCP 877.6
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: April 16, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 10, 2019Declaration
Date: February 03, 2017Declaration
Date: November 21, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2017Answer
Date: December 16, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 12, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 23, 2018Answer
Date: November 23, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: June 09, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2018Objections to Evidence
Date: September 26, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 16, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 30, 2017Motion In Limine
Date: October 09, 2018Declaration
Date: September 21, 2017Supplemental
Date: August 05, 2016Declaration
Date: January 06, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: August 01, 2016Declaration
Date: February 23, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 25, 2016Notice
Date: June 17, 2016Order
Date: February 05, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 10, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 05, 2018Declaration
Date: February 23, 2018Declaration in Reply
Date: June 21, 2019Supplemental
Date: August 05, 2016Notice
Date: November 09, 2018Notice
Date: January 02, 2019Separate Statement
Date: February 23, 2018Notice
Date: February 25, 2019Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: November 19, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 13, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 10, 2018Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: July 17, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: March 13, 2017Non-Opposition to
Date: December 24, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 09, 2018Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: October 12, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 12, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 11, 2018Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: October 10, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 09, 2018Motion In Limine
Date: October 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 05, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 05, 2018Motion In Limine
Date: October 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Motion In Limine
Date: September 28, 2018Motion to Compel Further
Date: May 09, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: April 23, 2018Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: April 17, 2018Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: March 19, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 07, 2017Motion for Judgment
Date: October 20, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: October 19, 2017Objection
Date: October 05, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 21, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 21, 201710 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: April 28, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: March 30, 2017Cross Complaint
Date: March 21, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: March 21, 2017Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 13, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: March 08, 2017Notice
Date: February 28, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 07, 2017Hearing on Demurrer
Date: February 07, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 03, 2017Objection
Date: February 03, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2017To Set
Date: January 11, 2017Statement
Date: January 04, 2017Hearing on Demurrer
Date: December 28, 2016Reply
Date: December 20, 2016Objection
Date: December 07, 2016Motion hearings
Date: December 07, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2016Objection
Date: December 01, 2016Reply
Date: November 29, 2016Opposition
Date: November 29, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: November 22, 2016Declaration
Date: November 22, 2016Points and Authorities
Date: November 21, 2016Notice
Date: November 21, 2016Demurrer to
Date: November 21, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: October 19, 2016Notice
Date: October 18, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: October 14, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: October 13, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: October 11, 2016Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment
Date: August 17, 2016Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment
Date: August 12, 2016Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: December 10, 2019Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: October 01, 2019Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: July 02, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 21, 2019Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: July 02, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: May 29, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 14, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 14, 2019Objection
Date: May 02, 2019Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: April 23, 2019Motion for Good Faith Settlement
Date: January 07, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 26, 2016Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment
Date: July 26, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 25, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 25, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: July 12, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: March 07, 2016Complaint
Date: November 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 12/10/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF Notice of Entry of Order DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Type: DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF ANDY SABERI, JAMES M DOMBROSKI AND Order Type: DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF ANDY SABERI, JAMES M DOMBROSKI AND THOMAS SABERI Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 10/8/19 |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF; SENT TO DEPT 1 F Proposed Order Received ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF; SENT TO DEPT 1 FOR SIGNATURE |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Issue and Monetary Sanction 10/03/2019 Motion for Issue and Monetary Sanction MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AS SANCTIONS AGAINST ANDY SABERI, JAMES DOMBROWSKI, AND THOMAS SABERI, HIS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AS SANCTIONS AGAINST ANDY SABERI AND JAMES DOMBROSKI Defendant BJ Interstate Auto Transporters, Inc.'s (BJ Interstate) 8-16-19 "Motion for Attorney's Fees as Sanctions," filed pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. 128.5, is DENIED, for the reasons set forth below. First, the motion is a belated motion for reconsideration. Code Civ. Proc. 1008(b). On 10-10-18, Plaintiff dismissed its entire case against BJ Interstate. Thereafter, on 4-5-19, BJ Interstate moved for sanctions against Plaintiff under Code Civ. Proc. 128.5, asserting the same arguments it now rehashes here. BJ Interstate argued in the prior motion, inter alia, that Plaintiff knew or should have known from the day he filed this case, and certainly from the time Plaintiff filed his First Amended Complaint (FAC), that his claim(s) against BJ Interstate had no merit, and yet Plaintiff continued pursuing its case against BJ until two days prior to the scheduled trial date. The Court already considered this argument and, on 5-20-19, denied BJ's previous motion for 128.5 sanctions. 5-20-19 Minute Order. The present motion is indistinguishable from the prior motion. Because it was not filed within 10 days of the Court's 5-20-19 Minute Order, it is untimely. Code Civ. Proc. 1008. Second, and as separate grounds for denying the motion, as stated in the Court's 5-20-19 Minute Order, BJ Interstate failed to comply with 128.5's safe harbor provision. As it argued in its prior motion for sanctions, BJ Interstate again contends Plaintiff persisted in pursuing a clearly meritless Complaint and First Amended Complaint (FAC), despite knowing that co-defendant Dedyk was insured at the time of loss, which purportedly barred any suit against BJ Interstate. 128.5 requires that the offending party be given an opportunity to withdraw the offending pleading. 128.5(f)(1)(B). BJ Interstate has not alleged compliance with this procedural requirement. Indeed, Plaintiff could not have withdrawn any offending pleading, because Plaintiff dismissed BJ Interstate from the case long before this motion was filed. Further, the motion appears based in part on Plaintiff's discovery responses. 128.5 does not apply to discovery requests, responses, objections and discovery motions. 128.5(e). For at least the foregoing reasons, the motion is DENIED. BJ Interstate's 9-26-19 Evidentiary Objection to Parag. 12 of the Dombroski Decl. is OVERRULED, and its related 9-26-19 "Motion to Strike" is DENIED. The Court notes, however, that Parag. 12 of the Dombroski is irrelevant to the Court's ruling on this motion. Continuing the parties' seemingly never-ending request for sanctions against one another, Plaintiff requests sanctions against BJ Interstate for having had to oppose this motion. In the Court's discretion, Plaintiff's request is DENIED. |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Party shall prepare formal order consistent w/order herein James Dombroski |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 10/01/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Last Continuance Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Report RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Status Report RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Objections to Evidence AND MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPH 12 OF THE DECLARATION OF JAMES DOMBROSKI IN OP Objections to Evidence AND MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPH 12 OF THE DECLARATION OF JAMES DOMBROSKI IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES ETC.. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.