Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Impact Paper & Ink, Ltd, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Jacuzzi, Marc L., against Pacific Business Supplies, Sajadi, Alan, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan L. Greenberg presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management115 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial385 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1197 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time479 days |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. The plaintiff, Impact Paper and Ink, LTD, is suing the defendant, Alan Sa3adi, individually and doing business as Pacific Business Supplies. The case number is CIV53193...
Motion to Enforce Stipulation
Date: April 10, 2018Order
Date: April 10, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 18, 2018Declaration
Date: May 22, 2018Declaration
Date: February 23, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 23, 2017Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 18, 2018Declaration
Date: March 15, 2018Declaration
Date: February 08, 2018Declaration
Date: February 08, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 22, 2018Declaration
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 16, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: February 23, 2017Judgment
Date: May 15, 2018Declaration
Date: January 25, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 15, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 15, 2018Declaration
Date: April 03, 2018Further Proceedings
Date: September 05, 2018Supplemental
Date: July 09, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 13, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 22, 2018Declaration
Date: May 22, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 03, 2018Declaration
Date: March 27, 2018Opposition
Date: March 27, 2018Motion
Date: March 15, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: February 23, 2018Objections to Evidence
Date: February 16, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 23, 2017Motion
Date: May 26, 2017Declaration
Date: February 23, 2017Declaration
Date: February 23, 2017Opposition
Date: February 23, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: February 23, 2017Order
Date: May 12, 2016Document
Date: May 12, 2016Order
Date: April 22, 2016Document
Date: April 22, 2016Order
Date: January 27, 2016Declaration
Date: December 29, 2015Conversion Action
Date: November 05, 2015Declaration
Date: November 05, 2015Order
Date: October 21, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: July 07, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: April 06, 2015General Denial filed
Date: February 24, 2015Complaint
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Further Proceedings 09/05/2018 Further Proceedings Re: Court vacating the Order awarding attorney fees Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing Addressing whether the court should vacate Order awarding atty fees Notice of Court Hearing Addressing whether the court should vacate Order awarding atty fees |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy Stay | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Type: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEESSigned by: JUDGE GREENBERGDate Signed: 07/24/18 Order Type: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 07/24/18 |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Attorney Fees 07/16/2018 Motion for Attorney Fees Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Supplemental SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF NANCY L. MCCOY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IMPACT PAPER & INC. SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF NANCY L. MCCOY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IMPACT PAPER & INC. LTD'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, ETC |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF NANCY L MCCOY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IMPACT Proof of Service by MAIL of SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF NANCY L MCCOY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IMPACT PAPER & INK, LTD, ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: DAVID R. GRIFFITHNew Attorney: SELF Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: DAVID R. GRIFFITH New Attorney: SELF |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CONTINUED MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Notice OF CONTINUED MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of PLAINTIFF IMPACT PAPER & INK, LTD'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTO Proof of Service by MAIL of PLAINTIFF IMPACT PAPER & INK, LTD'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, ETC..... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.