Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M., against Hochheiser, Steve, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
Time To Management129 days |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2014 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Complaint
Date: August 11, 2014Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 11, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 11, 2014Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: October 07, 2025Conversion Hearing
Date: December 18, 2014Conversion Action
Date: August 14, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
October 07, 2025 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Conversion Hearing |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE Conversion Action DDD: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
(S) COMPLAINT FILED Complaint COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. Summons Issued / Filed S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Civil Case Cover Sheet CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 140811-0493-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.