Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moore, Harvey M, against Vargas, Teresita A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrandsaert, John L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2011 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Citibank (South Dakota), N.A. against Teresita A Vargas. The complaint alleges breach of contract and common counts. The amount demanded in the complaint is $27,208, plus prejudgment interest at a rate to b...
Conversion Action
Date: January 10, 2013Notice
Date: January 23, 2013Order
Date: January 10, 2013Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: March 09, 2016MEMOR
Date: December 14, 2022NOR
Date: December 14, 2022APP
Date: December 14, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: January 20, 2011Conversion Hearing
Date: May 20, 2011Conversion Action
Date: July 28, 2015Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190)
Date: December 14, 2022Black and White10104
Date: January 17, 2023Conversion Action
Date: March 09, 2016Notice of Renewal of Judgment
Date: December 14, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption
Date: July 07, 2016Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: December 14, 2022Order Determining Claim of Exemption
Date: August 03, 2016Document
Date: July 25, 2016Notice to Levying Officer given to filer
Date: July 07, 2016Writ of Execution Return
Date: July 06, 2016Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: July 28, 2015Conversion Action
Date: December 07, 2015Stipulation filed
Date: January 10, 2013Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 07, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 20, 2011Complaint
Date: January 20, 2011Claim of Exemption
Date: July 25, 2016Notice
Date: July 07, 2016Writ of Execution Return
Date: February 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Black and White10104 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; Proof of Service by MAIL of PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; APPLICATION FOR/AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMOR | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOR | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | APP | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) Against: TERESITA A. VARGAS Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) Against: TERESITA A. VARGAS |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 0 Credit: 16225.00 Interest: 5729.19 |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: SAN FRANCISCOStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 030916Amount: 27717.3 Writ of Execution Return County: SAN FRANCISCO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 030916 Amount: 27717.32 |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption Certified copy forwarded to Levying Officer of: SAN FRANCISCO C Order Determining Claim of Exemption Certified copy forwarded to Levying Officer of: SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY. Copies mailed to all parties. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.