Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Chang, Michael, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Stanzler, Jordan S, against Farmers Group, Inc, Farmers Group, Inc., A California Corp, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. A California Corporation, Farmers Insurance Exchange Insurance Exchange, (total of 6) See All represented by Peer, John E, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
Category(18) Unlimited Insurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Michael Chang against Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Group, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, and Truck Insurance Exchange. The complaint alleges breach of contract, breach of implied covenant of good faith and fa...
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: June 25, 2014Order
Date: June 17, 2014Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: July 25, 2014Document
Date: June 02, 2014Declaration
Date: June 02, 2014Declaration
Date: May 13, 2014Document
Date: May 30, 2014Document
Date: May 27, 2014Opposition
Date: May 20, 2014Document
Date: May 13, 2014Declaration
Date: May 06, 2014Conversion Action
Date: May 12, 2014Response
Date: May 06, 2014Declaration
Date: April 29, 2014Amended
Date: April 28, 2014Notice
Date: April 23, 2014Document
Date: February 11, 2014Document
Date: December 16, 2013Motion
Date: November 27, 2013Motions in Limine Filed
Date: November 20, 2013Motions in Limine Filed
Date: November 20, 2013Conversion Action
Date: October 08, 2013Document
Date: October 11, 2013Declaration
Date: October 01, 2013Document
Date: October 01, 2013Opposition
Date: October 01, 2013Conversion Action
Date: October 08, 2013Document
Date: October 01, 2013Declaration
Date: October 01, 2013Conversion Action
Date: October 01, 2013Declaration
Date: April 29, 2014Declaration
Date: April 29, 2014Declaration
Date: April 29, 2014Declaration
Date: April 29, 2014Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 29, 2014Motion
Date: April 29, 2014Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 22, 2010Declaration
Date: September 12, 2013Document
Date: September 18, 2013Conversion Action
Date: September 03, 2013Response
Date: August 29, 2013Opposition
Date: August 29, 2013Declaration
Date: August 08, 2013Conversion Action
Date: August 08, 2013Document
Date: August 08, 2013Motion
Date: August 08, 2013Conversion Action
Date: July 26, 2013Document
Date: July 26, 2013Declaration
Date: July 26, 2013Conversion Action
Date: July 26, 2013Declaration
Date: July 11, 2013Notice
Date: July 22, 2013Notice
Date: July 11, 2013Document
Date: July 11, 2013Ex Parte Application
Date: June 26, 2013Declaration
Date: July 11, 2013Declaration
Date: June 26, 2013Conversion Action
Date: June 26, 2013Request
Date: June 25, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 25, 2013Motion
Date: June 25, 2013Declaration
Date: June 25, 2013Notice
Date: June 17, 2013Document
Date: June 10, 2013Conversion Action
Date: June 10, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 21, 2013Order
Date: February 04, 2013Declaration
Date: July 31, 2012Document
Date: January 30, 2013Declaration
Date: January 25, 2013Declaration
Date: January 18, 2013Motion
Date: January 18, 2013Declaration
Date: January 18, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 18, 2013Declaration
Date: January 18, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 18, 2013Order
Date: January 18, 2013Notice
Date: November 14, 2012Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 31, 2012Ex Parte
Date: July 31, 2012Conversion Action
Date: July 31, 2012Document
Date: August 01, 2012Order
Date: July 31, 2012Declaration
Date: July 31, 2012Case Management Statement
Date: July 20, 2012Conversion Action
Date: July 11, 2012Case Management Statement
Date: July 24, 2012Conversion Action
Date: June 27, 2012Complaint
Date: October 28, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CHANG FILED Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CHANG FILED |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JMT SERVED ON MICHAEL CHANG, FARMERS Proof of Service by MAIL of PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JMT SERVED ON MICHAEL CHANG, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, TRUCK INSURACE EXCHANGE FILED. DATE OF MAILING 07/25/14. |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT, SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON Order O2: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT, SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 06/16/14 FILED. |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - FWD TO DEPT. 7. |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY LORRAINE ON 06/03/14. |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute GRA: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT BY FARMERS INSURANCE IS GRANTED. |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MAS: MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED TO THE COURT. |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute TCS: THE COURT STATED THAT FARMERS PETITION FOR COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IS GRANTED. |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute TCS: THE COURT STATED THAT GREAT AMERICAN INS. CO'S APPLICATION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IS GRANTED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.