Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GENESIS SUNGA VS. WALGREENS CORPORATION
A (36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination case was filed by Sunga, Genesis, against Walgreens Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. Judge George A. Miram presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 06, 2009
Last Refreshed
December 10, 2021
Filing Location
San Mateo County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Scott, Joseph;Category
(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Wrongful Termination
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Complaint
Date: Apr 06, 2009Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GENESIS SUNGA. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 17 - |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PDUCMS: PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT AN UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY C LYSSAND ON 12/01/09. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM: THE COURT ADVISED MR. SUNGA TO FILE A PROOF OF SERVICE. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM: THE PLAINTIFF WAS GIVEN A LAWYER REFERRAL SERVICE LIST. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/03/10 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 7. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PGN: PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: LYNDON UNISA WAS SWORN TO ACT AS TAGALOG INTERPRETER ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PTYPP: GENESIS SUNGA PRESENT IN PRO PER. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM: MR. SUNGA INFORMED THE COURT WALGREENS CORPORATION HAS BEEN SERVED. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCRB: HONORABLE GEORGE A. MIRAM, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: CHERYL LYSSAND, COURT REPORTER: LORNA TRAUBE Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 28 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HOCMC CALENDARED ON 12/01/09 IN DEPT. 25. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 12/01/09 IN DEPT. 28. |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HCMC1I CALENDARED ON 12/01/09 IN DEPT. 25. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 12/01/09 IN DEPT. 28. |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/01/09 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 25. |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE 10/22/09 CMC AND FAILURE TO FILE A CMC STATEMENT (AS TO GENESIS SUNGA). |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 25 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 25 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE 10/22/09 CMC AND FAILURE TO FILE A CMC STATEMENT (AS TO GENESIS SUNGA). |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE 11/24/09 CMC GRANTED BY JUDGE SCOTT. |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GENESIS SUNGA. |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE 11/24/09 CMC FORWARDED TO DEPT. 25 FOR CONSIDERATION. |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE REC'D; LOCATED TO DEPT 2 FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order O2: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS AS TO GENESIS SUNGA, SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 10/22/09 FILED. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 11 - |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY C LYSSAND ON 10/22/09. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO GENESIS SUNGA FOR FAILURE TO |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: APPEAR AT TODAY'S CMC AND FAILURE TO FILE A CMC STATEMENT: NOVEMBER 24, 2009, AT 9:00 A.M., IN |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: DEPARTMENT 25. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute SUCMS: PLAINTIFF SHALL SUBMIT AN UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CCN: CLERK`S OFFICE TO SEND NOTICE. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/24/09 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 25. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCRB: HONORABLE JOSEPH C. SCOTT, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: CHERYL LYSSAND, COURT REPORTER: STACY GASKILL Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 25 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NAP: NO APPEARANCE IS MADE BY ANY PARTIES HEREIN OR THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PDUCMS: PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT AN UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY C LYSSAND ON 08/13/09. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 5 - |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/22/09 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 25. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: SERVICES LIST. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: THE COURT ADVISED MR. SUNGA THE DEFENDANT MUST BE SERVED. MR. SUNGA WAS GIVEN A LAWYER REFERRAL |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CCN: CLERK`S OFFICE TO SEND NOTICE. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCRB: HONORABLE JOSEPH C. SCOTT, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: CHERYL LYSSAND, COURT REPORTER: ANNETTE JAYCOX Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PTYPP: GENESIS SUNGA PRESENT IN PRO PER. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 25 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Conversion Hearing Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute AP: ALSO PRESENT: ARMANDO MAGBOO, TAGALOG INTERPRETER FOR PLAINTIFF. |
|
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HCMC1I CALENDARED ON 08/13/09 IN DEPT. 11. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/13/09 IN DEPT. 25. |
|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GENESIS SUNGA. |
|
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Granted OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY GENESIS SUNGA GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00, SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER ON 04/07/09. |
|
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Granted on Additional Court Fees OWFGS: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GENESIS SUNGA GRANTED FOR 999.99 IN THE AMOUNT OF $999.99, SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER ON 04/07/09. |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
(S) COMPLAINT FILED Complaint COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Additional Court Fees APWFS: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GENESIS SUNGA FOR JURY FEES, INTERPRETERS, WITNESS & OTHER FEES |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. Summons Issued / Filed S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GENESIS SUNGA. |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL DELIVERY BY A. DEGLIANTONI FILED Affidavit AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL DELIVERY BY A. DEGLIANTONI FILED |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Civil Case Cover Sheet CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED |