Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
1 To 500 John & Jane Does 225 Berry St #321 San Francisco, Ca 94158, Allen, Sharon, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Per, against Does 1 To 500, La Salle Apt. Building Complex, La Salle Apt. Building Complex Co., La Salle Preservation, L.P. (Erroneously Sued As, Related Management Co., (total of 8) See All represented by D'Argenio, Mark J, Hamant, Candice Nguyen, Nguyen, Candice H, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with CHARLES F. HAINES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES F. HAINES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a civil wrongful eviction case filed by Sharon Allen against Related Management and La Salle Apartments. The case number is CGC-23-605806. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction ...
DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, SHARON
Date: April 13, 2023CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, SHARON
Date: April 13, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ALLEN, SHARON
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 13, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ALLEN, SHARON 1 TO 500 JOHN & JANE DOES
Date: May 01, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, SHARON
Date: December 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2024 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 27, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRNATING SPECIAL MOTION TO STIRKE PURUSANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCUDURE SECTION 425.1 (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION) (TRANSACTION ID # 210057285) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOLOMAN, STACEY (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "STACY SOLOMAN") | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-27-2023 CONTINUED TO FEB-28-2024 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE AND SERVE ORDER RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER AUG-29-2023 RULING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, SHARON 1 TO 500 JOHN & JANE DOES | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 71615440) FILED BY DEFENDANT RELATED MANAGEMENT COMPANY, L.P. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RELATIVE MANAGEMENT CO.) ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT LA SALLE PRESERVATION, L.P. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS LA SALLE APART. BUILDING COMPANY) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING STACEY SOLOMAN'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION) | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 71620796) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOLOMAN, STACEY (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "STACY SOLOMAN") ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, SHARON | |
October 25, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.