Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Environmental Health Advocates, Inc., filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Glick, Noam, against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.,, W3Ll People, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, represented by Degen, Alycia A, Lally, Amy P., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2023 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 23, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-29-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR - JCCP 5285. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDERS ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 210055076) FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTA SALON, COSMETICS & FRAGRANCE, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION W3LL PEOPLE, INC. | |
November 29, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-29-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR - JCCP 5285. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE COORDINATION WITH JCCP AND STAY ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 210048320) FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTA SALON, COSMETICS & FRAGRANCE, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION W3LL PEOPLE, INC. | |
August 23, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-23-2023 CONTINUED TO NOV-29-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF COORDINATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ***FEE PAID**** STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND (PROPOSED) ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 210044671) FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTA SALON, COSMETICS & FRAGRANCE, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION W3LL PEOPLE, INC. AS TO PLAINTIFF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC. | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100207582) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210043316) FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTA SALON, COSMETICS & FRAGRANCE, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION W3LL PEOPLE, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100207582) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.