Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Katz, Jami Handelman, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Putterman, Donald Jon, against Does 1-25, Inclusive, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, represented by Haines, Kelsey D., Herrmann, Jodie, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2020 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 25, 2020ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT
Date: April 08, 2021ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY JODIE HERRMANN INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE. | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100163030) | |
April 27, 2022 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE CALENDAR FOR ATTORNEY JODIE HERRMANN
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
April 13, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-13-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-10-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210003911) FILED BY DEFENDANT MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED ALSO FILED BY PLAINTIFF KATZ, JAMI HANDELMAN ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JODIE HERRMANN TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY APR-27-2022 | |
March 09, 2022 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JODIE HERRMANN
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 12, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.