Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Balabbo, Precila, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Smith, Evan J., against Almar Sales Co., Inc., Cvs Pharmacy, Inc., represented by Maxwell, James Robert, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
This complaint is a representative action brought by Plaintiff Precila Balabbo against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Almar Sales Co., Inc. The complaint alleges violations of the Safe Drinking Water and Toxic Enforcement Act of 1986, also known as Propositi...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 20, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100111728)
Date: September 17, 2020ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-21-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100111728) | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: THE UNDERSIGNED WARRANT THAT THEY ARE AUTHORIZED TO EXECUTE THIS CONSENT JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF THEIR RESPECTIVE PARTIES AND HAVE READ, UNDERSTOOD AND AGREE TO ALL THE TERMS OF THIS CONSENT JUDGMENT. EACH PARTY IS TO BEAR ITS OWN ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT | |
September 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgment
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF PRECILA BALABBO'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED AND THE SETTLEMENT COMPLIES WITH THE REQUIREMENTS FOR PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENTS UNDER HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTION 25249.7. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE WARNING THAT IS REQUIRED BY THE SETTLEMENT COMPLIES WITH HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTIONS 25249.5-25249.14; THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES IS REASONABLE UNDER CALIFORNIA LAW; AND THE PENALTY AMOUNT IS REASONABLE BASED ON THE CRITERIA SET FORTH IN HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTION 25249.7(B)(2). ORDER AND CONSENT JUDGMENT SIGNED. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, CLERK: S. LE, NOT REPORTED. =(302/EPS) | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-08-2020 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 200015509) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALMAR SALES CO., INC. | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200015509) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALMAR SALES CO., INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.