Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Powers, Winona, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Low, Joseph H., against Does 1-25, Inclusive, Levi Strauss & Co., Levi Strauss & Co., A Delaware Corp, represented by Beckwith, Amanda E., Kearnaghan, Jason W., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Winona Powers against Levi Strauss & Co. and Does 1-25. The complaint alleges violations of Labor Code section 203 for late payment of wages. In the first count, it is stated that Winona Powers was employed...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 200043342) FILED BY DEFENDANT LEVI STRAUSS & CO.
Date: November 09, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200042387) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POWERS, WINONA
Date: October 27, 2021JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100116240) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF POWERS, WINONA
Date: November 12, 2020ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-20-584035 WITH CASE CGC-19-581624 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: November 18, 2020ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF WINONA POWERS' AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER TO QUASH SUBPOENAS
Date: September 09, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100108072) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POWERS, WINONA
Date: August 03, 2020AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200007112) FILED BY DEFENDANT LEVI STRAUSS & CO.
Date: February 11, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200006925) FILED BY DEFENDANT LEVI STRAUSS & CO.
Date: February 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 17, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-17-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-16-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE JUDGMENT OR OBTAIN DISMISSAL ORDER PER CRC 3.770 IN DEPARTMENT 302. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF WINONA POWER'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT | |
April 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Plaintiff Winona Powers Notice Of And Motion For Approval Of Paga Settlement; Declaration Of John R. Matheny In Support (Motions)
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW & MOTION, DEPT. 302, AS TO THE APR-05-2022 HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF WINONA POWERS'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT. THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFF' UNOPPOSED "MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT" IS GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR.; CLERK: SEAN KANE; COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR NO. 8600, MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM (302/RBU) | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-05-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF WINONA POWERS NOTICE OF AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF JOHN R. MATHENY IN SUPPORT (MOTIONS), PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION (W/ CRT RPT FEE) (TRANSACTION ID # 210001887) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POWERS, WINONA HEARING SET FOR APR-05-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
February 15, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (NOTICES) (TRANSACTION ID # 210000224) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POWERS, WINONA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.