Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Freitas, Casey, Rodriguez, Claudious Williams, Rodriguez, Patrick Williams, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Hersh-Boyle, Kate, against Danielle E. Lane, M.D. Inc., Danielle E. Lane, M.D., Inc.,, Danielle Lane, M.D., Inc,, Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Fan M.D, Mark, (total of 8) See All represented by Supple, John Linck, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 28, 2019 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
This complaint is a request for judicial notice in support of defendants Danielle Lane, M.D., Mark Fan, M.D., and Danielle E. Lane, M.D., Inc. dba Lane Fertility Institute's demurrer to portions of plaintiffs' complaint. The plaintiffs in this case a...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-09-2021 VACATED. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206) | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66432271) (TRANSACTION ID # 66432271) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANIELLE E. LANE, M.D. INC. DBA LANE FERTILITY INSTITUTE | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE OF LEAD CASE CGC-19-580309 (TRANSACTION ID # 66332131) | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE OF CONSOLIDATE CASE CGC-19-580659 (TRANSACTION ID # 66332131) | |
December 16, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-09-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-16-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66153687) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAN M.D, MARK DANIELLE E. LANE, M.D. INC. DBA LANE FERTILITY INSTITUTE LANE M.D., DANIELLE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS | |
November 17, 2020 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-16-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE NOV-17-2020 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.