Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Center For Advanced Public Awareness, Inc., filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints (/ Complaint For Injunctive Relief And Civil Penalties) case represented by Kawahito, James, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc., Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc. D B A La Brea, represented by Grimaldi, Ann G, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (/ Complaint For Injunctive Relief And Civil Penalties) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time139 days |
This complaint is a response from the defendant, Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc. dba La Brea Collective, to a complaint filed by the plaintiff, Center for Advanced Public Awareness. The defendant denies the allegations made in the complaint and asserts ...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 14, 2019ORDER GRANTING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2019 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-17-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgment
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 25249.7 (F)(4) AND CCP 664.6, JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE CONSENT JUDGMENT ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT 1. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF CENTER FOR ADVANCED PUBLIC AWARENESS, INC.'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED AND THE SETTLEMENT COMPLIES WITH THE REQUIREMENTS FOR PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENTS UNDER HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTION 25249.7. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE WARNINGS THAT ARE REQUIRED BY THE SETTLEMENT COMPLIES WITH HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTIONS 25249.5-25249.14; THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES IS REASONABLE UNDER CALIFORNIA LAW; AND THE PENALTY AMOUNT IS REASONABLE BASED ON THE CRITERIA SET FORTH IN HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTION 25249.7(B)(2). ORDER AND JUDGMENT ARE SIGNED. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, CLERK: S. LE, NOT REPORTED. =(302/EPS) | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-25-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100071558) FILED BY DEFENDANT MID CITY CANNABIS CLUB, INC. D/B/A LA BREA COLLECTIVE | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100070763) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CENTER FOR ADVANCED PUBLIC AWARENESS, INC. , IN TH EPUBLIC INTEREST HEARING SET FOR JUN-25-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JAMES KAWAHITO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100070763) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CENTER FOR ADVANCED PUBLIC AWARENESS, INC. , IN TH EPUBLIC INTEREST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.