Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bonnici, Timothy A, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Macomber, Tara J., Molinari, Gino Joseph, Pro Per, against Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Henry, Carroll, Mcmackin, Charles, represented by Lieberman, Richard Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions267 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
This complaint document is a proof of service by first-class mail in a civil case. The petitioner/plaintiff is identified as "m otly kK ' Bs Ml Ct" and the respondent/defendant is identified as "Charl» NeWackin au Dp Cavtoll fonvy." The case number i...
NOTICE RE: JUDICIAL MEDIATION. SENT BY COURT
Date: March 13, 2020PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64163988)
Date: September 05, 2019ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2019ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: October 03, 2018ORDER TO SET TRIAL DATE
Date: December 03, 2020NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT. (206)
Date: December 03, 2020NOTICE RE: JUDICIAL MEDIATION. SENT BY COURT
Date: August 28, 2020ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: October 11, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-08-2019 9:30 AM
Date: May 08, 2019ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: December 15, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61710423)
Date: February 20, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BONNICI, TIMOTHY A AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: March 23, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-05-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66369077) | |
January 25, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-25-2021 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-05-2022 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL MEDIATION OF SEP-29-2020, HELD AND CASE SETTLED. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 66196652) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCMACKIN, CHARLES AN INDIVIDUAL HENRY, CARROLL AN INDIVIDUAL | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET TRIAL DATE | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT. (206) | |
December 03, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION TO CONTINUE COURT TRIAL
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.