Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Angelique Rochelle As Guardian Ad Litem Of, Rochelle, Angelique, Rochelle, Baz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hooshmand, Mark, against Deng, May, Deng, Trevor, Does 1 To 10, Tan, Yu Tao, Tan, Yu Yao, (total of 5) See All represented by Piccinini, Daniel, Rodzewich, Edward J, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions343 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time729 days |
TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 61382051) FILED BY DEFENDANT DENG, TREVOR DENG, MAY
Date: November 20, 2017ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: January 19, 2021MINUTES FOR FEB-07-2018 4:00 PM
Date: February 07, 2018REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A154400 DIV 3
Date: November 20, 2020CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: December 07, 2018REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A155054 DIV 3
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT
Date: October 05, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 6-14-18)
Date: August 16, 2018NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT - NICORA
Date: May 25, 2018ORDER AFTER MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: April 24, 2018ORDER AFTER MOTION TO TAX/STRIKE COSTS
Date: April 24, 2018ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT - LEONA PASLAY
Date: April 03, 2018ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT - ELLA ROCHELLE-LAWTON
Date: April 03, 2018MINUTES FOR MAR-21-2018 2:00 PM
Date: March 21, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 02, 2018MINUTES FOR DEC-04-2017 9:30 AM
Date: December 04, 2017JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: December 04, 2017JURY NOTES
Date: December 04, 2017WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: December 04, 2017JURY VERDICT - SPECIAL VERDICT FORM
Date: December 04, 2017EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: December 04, 2017EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: December 04, 2017MINUTES FOR DEC-01-2017 9:30 AM
Date: December 01, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-29-2017 9:30 AM
Date: November 29, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-30-2017 9:00 AM
Date: November 30, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-27-2017 9:30 AM
Date: November 27, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-28-2017 9:30 AM
Date: November 28, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-21-2017 9:30 AM
Date: November 21, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-20-2017 9:30 AM
Date: November 20, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-16-2017 10:00 AM
Date: November 16, 2017LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS (TRANSACTION ID # 61361221) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, YU YAO
Date: November 14, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-14-2017 9:30 AM
Date: November 14, 2017JURY VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 61361221) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, YU YAO
Date: November 14, 2017LIST OF WITNESSES (TRANSACTION ID # 61361221) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, YU YAO
Date: November 14, 2017ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: October 30, 2017ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: October 16, 2017CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60522948) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, YU YAO
Date: April 26, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 08, 2016ORDER APPROVING THE COMPROMISE OF A PENDING ACTION OF A MINOR, LEONA PASLAY
Date: April 03, 2018TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 61361221) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, YU YAO
Date: November 14, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61470870)
Date: December 14, 2017ORDER APPROVING THE COMPROMISE OF A PENDING ACTION OF A MINOR: ELLA ROCHELLE-LAWTON
Date: April 03, 2018ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: February 14, 2018ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT
Date: February 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on calendar for Tuesday, January 19, 2021, Line 2, DEFENDANTs TREVOR DENG and MAY DENG's Motion For Attorneys Fees: Grant. No opposition filed. Counsel for the defendants is required to prepare... | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: (AN AMENDED JUDGMENT FROM APRIL 24, 2018 WAS $148,375.12; ORDER GRANTING ADDTIONAL ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS OF $48,077.50; NEW JUDGMENT AMOUNT IS $196,452.62) (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT) | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' FEES | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION DEPT. 302 - DEFENDANTS TREVOR DENG AND MAY DENG'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. WRITTEN ORDER IS SIGNED. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN; CLERK: J. RIOS MERIDA; REPORTER:PROCEEDING NOT REPORTED. | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-19-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
January 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Attorneys Fees
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL AND BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66197582) FILED BY DEFENDANT DENG, TREVOR DENG, MAY | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $48,077.50 TOTAL COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 66197582) FILED BY DEFENDANT DENG, TREVOR DENG, MAY | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ROBERT D FEIGHNER ESQ (TRANSACTION ID # 66197582) FILED BY DEFENDANT DENG, TREVOR DENG, MAY | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF EDWARD J RODZEWICH ESQ (TRANSACTION ID # 66197582) FILED BY DEFENDANT DENG, TREVOR DENG, MAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.