Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Held, Ph.D, P.E., Anthony E., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Paras, Laralei S., against Does 1-150 Inclusive, Lehigh Consumer Products Llc, represented by Mcnulty, Elizabeth V., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions166 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time175 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case between Anthony E. Held, Ph.D., P.E. as the plaintiff/petitioner and Lehigh Consumer Products LLC as the defendant/respondent. The document indicates that the plaintiff's attorn...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 17, 2016ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59845791)
Date: November 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-28-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59890421) AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-150 INCLUSIVE | |
November 16, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And [Proposed] Consent Judgment Matter on calendar for Wednesday, November 16, 2016, Line 10, PLAINTIFF ANTHONY HELD, PH.D, P.E. Motion...
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) (TRANSACTION ID # 59845791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, PH.D, P.E., ANTHONY E. | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) (TRANSACTION ID # 59845791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, PH.D, P.E., ANTHONY E. | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59845791) | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59845791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, PH.D, P.E., ANTHONY E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.