Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Glumac, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Francisconi, Eric P, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Zeta Communities, Inc. Dba Zeta Design + Build, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2015 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time259 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-20-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Default Prove Up Hearing
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100020319) | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF JUN-02-2016 NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL FILED. JUDGE: JOSEPH M. QUINN, CLERK: A. MOK. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY CSR: MITCH LYON, CSR#6840. (514) | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100016953) AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100016953) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLUMAC | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $703.68 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 100016953) AS TO DEFENDANT ZETA COMMUNITIES, INC. DBA ZETA DESIGN + BUILD | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100016953) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLUMAC AS TO DEFENDANT ZETA COMMUNITIES, INC. DBA ZETA DESIGN + BUILD HEARING SET FOR JUN-02-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RICHARD G. THOMAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100016953) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLUMAC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.