Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lee, Joycelyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Matz, Robert, against Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Tan, Desmond, represented by Ward, Robert C, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time856 days |
STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60196158) FILED BY TAN, DESMOND
Date: February 10, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61284980) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, JOYCELYN
Date: October 25, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61283274) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, DESMOND
Date: October 25, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61238488) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, JOYCELYN
Date: October 13, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60984431) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, DESMOND
Date: August 14, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60274297) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, DESMOND
Date: March 01, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 17, 2015ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: October 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF LEE, JOYCELYN TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT TAN, DESMOND SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DESMOND TAN'S [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT FILED NOVEMBER 27, 2017. (TRANSACTION ID # 61411403) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, JOYCELYN | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF LEE'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT TAN'S [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT FILED NOVEMBER 27, 2017 (TRANSACTION ID # 61411403) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, JOYCELYN | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61367105) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAN, DESMOND | |
October 30, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Enforce Settlement Agreement [Cal. Code Civ. Proc. Section 664.6] SET FOR HEARING ON MONDAY, OCTOBER 30, 2017, LINE 4 DEFENDANT DESMOND TAN'S Motion To Enforce Settlemen...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
October 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Enforce Settlement Agreement [Cal. Code Civ. Proc. Section 664.6]
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2017 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT DESMOND TAN'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT [PER CCP 664.6] WAS GRANTED IN LARGE PART AS REFLECTED ON THE RECORD AT THE PRIOR HEARINGS ON SEPTEMBER 8 AND OCTOBER 6. ON THE ONLY REMAINING ISSUES, THE COURT GRANTS THE MOTION IN SUBSTANTIAL PART WITH MODIFICATIONS AS DISCUSSED IN THE ORDER. ORDER IS SIGNED. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: REYES HUNTER, CSR #6576, EMAIL:RHUNTER@SFTC.ORG. (302) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.