Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Leeman Phd, Whitney R., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Johnson, Brian, against Amazon Com, Inc, Amazon.Com, Inc., Does 1 To 150, Inclusive, Magnell Associate, Inc, Newegg, Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Hodges, Ronald S., Ledger, Brian M., Margulies, Jeffrey B, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions980 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1043 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in the case of Whitney R. Leeman, Ph.D. v. Newegg, Inc., et al. The plaintiff's attorney, Brian Johnson, is requesting the dismissal of the action with prejudice as to Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. The case...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60204458) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEEMAN PHD, WHITNEY R.
Date: February 14, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LEEMAN PHD, WHITNEY R.
Date: August 02, 2016NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 23, 2014ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: December 10, 2015ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES
Date: March 24, 2016ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2016ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59618831) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC.
Date: September 27, 2016ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2017THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: March 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-05-2017 VACATED. DISMISSALS AND JUDGMENT ON FILE. (206) | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60792992) AS TO DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60792992) AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 150, INCLUSIVE | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60792992) AS TO DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC. | |
March 30, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgment Set for hearing for Thursday, March 30, 2017, line 6. PLAINTIFF WHITNEY LEEMAN'S Motion To Approve Proposition 65 ...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60405809) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEEMAN PHD, WHITNEY R. | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED / JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60405809) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEEMAN PHD, WHITNEY R. | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 60405809) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEEMAN PHD, WHITNEY R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.