Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NEEPA DEVENDRA PARIKH VS. SACHIO MAE et al
On July 02, 2014 a personal injury/property damage - vehicle related case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 02, 2014
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 8 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT
Vv.
SACHIO MAE, |
AND DOES 1 TO 100,
Defendants.
Defendant, SACHIO MAE, in answer to the Unverified
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed by Neepa Devendra Parikh against Sachio Mae and DOES 1 to 100 in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The complaint was filed on July 2, 2014. The plaintiff is being sued by Neepa Devendra Parikh. Th…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID 15151004) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO
Date: Jun 01, 2015ORDER AND STIPULATION TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT SACHIO MAE FOR DEPOSITION
Date: Oct 27, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO
Date: Sep 04, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Jul 02, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2015 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-11-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100003307) | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-08-2015 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 6/5/15. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-11-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. JUDGE: A\. JAMES ROBERTSON II; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
June 08, 2015 | hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100000368) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ROBERT MARCEREAU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NEEPA PARIKHS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100000193) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 100000193) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT SACHIO MAES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15151004) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15151004) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MONA L. BAUER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SACHIO MAES EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15151004) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15151004) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS LIEN (TRANSACTION ID # 57287352) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 15102084): DOLAN, CHRISTOPHER B. REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 15096004) FILED BY ATTORNEY MARCEREAU, ROBERT H | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 56584133): DOLAN, CHRISTOPHER B. ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
December 03, 2014 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-08-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-03-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS | |
October 30, 2014 | Tentative Ruling | Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendant Sachio Mae Matter on calendar for Thursday, October 30, 2014, line 6 - PLAINTIFF NEEPA PARIKHs Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendant S...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
October 30, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendant Sachio Mae
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY, 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFF NEEPA PARIKH'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SACHIO MAE IS OFF CALENDAR PER STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED ON OCTOBER 27, 2014. JUDGE PRO TEM ROBERT F. KANE, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED (302). | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT SACHIO MAE FOR DEPOSITION | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | FEE PAID ON STIP AND ORDER TO PRODUCE DEFT SACHIO MAE FOR DEPOSITION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SACHIO MAE, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA HEARING SET FOR OCT-30-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: TOSCHI, STEVEN CRAIG SUBSTITUTED FOR BJONERUD, DEBORAH TOMI AS ATTORNEY FOR MAE, SACHIO | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARIKH, NEEPA DEVENDRA AS TO DEFENDANT MAE, SACHIO DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-03-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-02-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-10-2014 | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |