Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Woods, Melissa, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Vanvleck, Brian F, against Cbre Group, Inc, Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, represented by Miller, Barbara J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
This complaint is a motion filed by the defendant, CBRE Group, Inc., in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Francisco. The defendant is seeking to compel the plaintiff, Melissa Woods, to arbitrate the claims alleged in the ac...
MOTION TO DISMISS (TRANSACTION ID # 100094957) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: January 27, 2020NOTICE OF RULING (TRANSACTION ID # 100097818) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: February 24, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE #4 (TRANSACTION ID # 100094739) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: January 23, 2020TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 100094924) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: January 27, 2020POST TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 100096704) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: February 11, 2020ORDER APPOINTING ARBITRATOR
Date: October 03, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100101894) FILED BY APPELLANT WOODS, MELISSA
Date: April 29, 2020ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: July 06, 2020REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: August 11, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: August 05, 2014REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A160477 DIV 5
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT
Date: July 09, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005754) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: September 23, 2015DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: April 11, 2014CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: October 08, 2020REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC
Date: September 09, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: March 04, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-14-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 14, 2020CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 17, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 18, 2014NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT WOODS, MELISSA
Date: June 17, 2020MINUTES FOR JAN-27-2020 1:30 PM
Date: January 27, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58183792) FILED BY ATTORNEY MILLER, BARBARA J.
Date: November 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A160477 DIV 5 | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $1,800.15 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JAN-10-2022,, (TRANSACTION ID # 100150567) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBRE GROUP, INC | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $38.40 RE 36383 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO TRANSCRIPT LEGAL (CSR), DOC#1910752471, WARRANT #38206562, DATED FEB-17-2021 | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $611.60 RE 36383 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO THE VAN VLECK LAW FIRM, DOC#1910752475, WARRANT #03820653, DATED FEB-17-2021 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 6 VOLS CT VIA TAP, 2 VOLS RT [APPEAL FILED 4/29/20, A160477 DIV 5] | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 65815684) BY APPELLANT WOODS, MELISSA | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 100107920) BY RESPONDENT CBRE GROUP, INC | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $1,308.00 | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $2,516.00 [$2,616 LESS $100] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.