Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kramer, Shelley, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Bogaards, Pieter, Peters, Craig M, Lucey, Michael Terrence, Mccarthy, Nancy P, against Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Katherine Catlos, An Individual, Kaufman Dolowich Voluck Gonzo, Llp, Kaufman Dolowich Voluck & Gonzo Llp, A Limited, represented by Lucey, Michael Terrence, Mccarthy, Nancy P, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions476 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time790 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Shelley Kramer against Kaufman Dolowich Voluck & Gonzo LLP, Katherine Catlos, and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges wrongful termination in violation of public policy, defamation per se, and d...
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KRAMER, SHELLEY
Date: June 18, 2014ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: March 12, 2014MINUTES FOR APR-16-2014 10:00 AM
Date: April 16, 2014MINUTES FOR JUN-03-2014 4:00 PM
Date: June 03, 2014NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT
Date: January 03, 2014CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL
Date: January 23, 2014MINUTES FOR MAY-07-2014 1:30 PM
Date: May 07, 2014MINUTES FOR MAR-28-2014 1:30 PM
Date: March 28, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-07-2014 10:00 AM
Date: January 07, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 19, 2013MINUTES FOR NOV-19-2013 10:30 AM
Date: November 19, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF KRAMER, SHELLEY
Date: January 24, 2013DECLARATION OF PIETER BOGAARDS; POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF KRAMER, SHELLEY
Date: April 02, 2013NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 02, 2012MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2013 10:00 AM
Date: November 08, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT KAUFMAN DOLOWICH VOLUCK GONZO, LLP
Date: October 29, 2013DECLARATION OF PIETER BOGAARDS FILED BY PLAINTIFF KRAMER, SHELLEY
Date: April 02, 2013OPPOSITION TO COMPEL PLTF'S SUBSEQUENT DEPO FILED BY PLAINTIFF KRAMER, SHELLEY
Date: April 02, 2013ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: September 23, 2013ORDER DENIED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND REQUEST FOR STAY (A140414 DIV. 2)
Date: December 23, 2013ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMINATION
Date: January 07, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF KRAMER, SHELLEY
Date: January 24, 2014ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 12/9/13 A140536 DIV 2
Date: February 10, 2014ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2014MINUTE ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: May 23, 2014REMITTITUR DISMISSED A140536 DIV 2
Date: April 10, 2014MINUTE ORDER RE: SPECIFICS AND DESCRIPTIONS OF FIVE MOTIONS AND OPPOSITIONS TO SAID MOTIONS
Date: September 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2014 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-16-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 20, 2014 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
August 29, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION / Notice
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
August 15, 2014 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 OSC - TRIAL DEPARTMENT
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL SENT BY COURT. ORDER TO SHOW CRC 3.1385 SET FOR AUGUST 15, 2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 RE DISMISSAL OFF CALENDAR DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR. MATTER SET FOR DECEMBER 16, 2014 AT 10:30AM IN DEPARTMENT 601, 400 MCALLISTER STREET, SAN FRANCISCO | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-15-2014 IN DEPT. 610 IS OFF CALENDAR. ORDER TO SHOW CRC 3.1385 SET FOR AUGUST 15, 2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 RE DISMISSAL OFF CALENDAR DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR. MATTER SET FOR DECEMBER 16, 2014 AT 10:30AM IN DEPARTMENT 601, 400 MCALLISTER STREET, SAN FRANCISCO NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 24, 2014 | Hearing |
Mtn To Compel Further Responses/Production To Document Demand, Set Six
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LUCEY, MICHAEL TERRENCE SUBSTITUTED FOR MCCARTHY, NANCY P AS ATTORNEY FOR KAUFMAN DOLOWICH VOLUCK & GONZO LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP REGISTERED WITH THE CALIFORNIA STATE BAR (NO 54084) KAUFMAN DOLOWICH VOLUCK GONZO, LLP KAUFMAN DOLOWICH VOLUCK GONZO, LLP | |
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.