Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Held, Anthony E, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Voorhees, D Joshua, against Does 1 To 150, Inclusive, Two'S Company, Inc., represented by Gallagher, Michael E, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions282 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time407 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC-11-516586 and it was filed by Wesley G. Ramirez. The parties involved are Anthony E. Held and Two's Company, Inc. The document requests the clerk to dismiss the action,...
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: September 11, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: July 05, 2012AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: July 05, 2012DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 150, INCLUSIVE
Date: September 21, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: April 27, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: September 21, 2012OPPOSITION TO MTN TO COMPEL FILED BY DEFENDANT TWO'S COMPANY, INC.
Date: May 15, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: July 05, 2012NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT TWO'S COMPANY, INC.
Date: January 13, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TWO'S COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 10, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: April 27, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: May 23, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 14, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E.
Date: May 25, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2013 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-11-2013 VACATED. JUDGMENT FILED ON 9/11/12. (206) | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 150, INCLUSIVE | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED APPROVING PROP 65 SETTLEMENT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF PROP 65 SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E. | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E PH.D., P.E. | |
September 11, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Propm 65 Settlement Matter on calendar for Tuesday, September 11, 2012, Line 11, PLAINTIFF ANTHONY HELD'S Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement. Granted. No opposition filed. T...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT | |
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT) | |
September 11, 2012 | Hearing |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Propm 65 Settlement
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF ANTHONY HELD'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROP 65 SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. THE SETTLEMENT COMPLIES WITH PROPOSITION 65. ORDER AND JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.